Iowa – Chickasaw – New Hampton
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
Iowa
Chickasaw
New Hampton
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
15736
1937
FDIC Certificate Number: 15736
FDIC's unique number: 9992
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Cedar Rapids
Federal Reserve ID Number: 668848
Report Date: 2010-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 2011-04-07
1937-06-16 Institution established. Original name: State Bank Of Lawler.
1998-07-27 Moved bank headquarters from Lawler, Iowa to New Hampton, Iowa.
2008-05-06 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2008-05-06 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2008-09-01 Changed name to Bank Iowa .
2011-03-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank Iowa in Clarinda, Iowa.
2011-04-14 Moved bank headquarters from New Hampton, Iowa to West Des Moines, Iowa.
Total assets: $206,135,000
Total deposits: $188,024,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
BANK IOWA does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with BANK IOWA, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and BANK IOWA will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19461