New Hampshire – Rockingham – Hampton
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
New Hampshire
Rockingham
Hampton
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
17879
1958
FDIC Certificate Number: 17879
FDIC's unique number: 11818
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 308809
Report Date: 1991-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 14835
The date of the last data update: 1991-10-24
1958-06-30 Institution established. Original name: Hampton National Bank.
1983-01-01 Changed name to Bank Meridian, National Association .
1991-10-10 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Citizens Bank New Hampshire in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-05-01 Reorganized.
1992-06-01 Acquired First Nh Bank, National Association in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Concord, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
1995-03-30 Acquired Southeast Bank For Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Total assets: $109,379,000
Total deposits: $105,416,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Bank Meridian, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bank Meridian, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank Meridian, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-23829