Georgia – Fulton – Atlanta
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Georgia
Fulton
Atlanta
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
57117
2001
FDIC Certificate Number: 57117
FDIC's unique number: 357985
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2962652
Report Date: 2008-03-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 24166
The date of the last data update: 2008-07-09
2001-02-13 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of America Georgia, National Association.
2008-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.
Total assets: $92,839,000
Total deposits: $500,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Bank of America Georgia, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bank of America Georgia, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of America Georgia, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19692