Texas – Henderson – Athens
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Texas
Henderson
Athens
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
24354
1983
FDIC Certificate Number: 24354
FDIC's unique number: 16947
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 141659
Report Date: 1994-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 17634
The date of the last data update: 1994-10-31
1983-02-07 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Athens, National Association.
1994-07-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First State Bank in Athens, Texas.
Total assets: $28,898,000
Total deposits: $25,782,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Bank of Athens, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bank of Athens, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Athens, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-9087