West Virginia – Logan – Chapmanville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
West Virginia
Logan
Chapmanville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
23457
1981
FDIC Certificate Number: 23457
FDIC's unique number: 16440
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Scott Depot
Federal Reserve ID Number: 888721
Report Date: 1996-09-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1996-10-31
1981-06-15 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Chapmanville.
1985-05-17 Reorganized.
1996-10-07 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Logan Bank & Trust Company in Logan, West Virginia.
2001-09-12 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2001-09-12 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
Total assets: $36,471,000
Total deposits: $32,368,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Bank of Chapmanville does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bank of Chapmanville, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Chapmanville will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-1467