Georgia – Dodge – Eastman
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.bankofeastman.com
Georgia
Dodge
Eastman
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
877
1919
FDIC Certificate Number: 877
FDIC's unique number: 559
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Albany Ga
Federal Reserve ID Number: 204237
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-02-04
1919-01-02 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Eastman.
1996-08-16 Reorganized.
Total assets: $246,747,000
Total deposits: $208,933,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $208,933,000
Equity capital: $17,252,000
Net income: $-2,070,000
Return on Assets: -1.59
Return on Equity: -23.06
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Magnolia Bankshares, Inc.
Bank Of Eastman - 2451 North Columbia Street Branch
Bank Of Eastman - Bank Of Eastman
Bank Of Eastman - Magnolia State Bank -gray
Bank Of Eastman - Magnolia State Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Bank of Eastman does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bank of Eastman, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Eastman will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-14915