Louisiana – De Soto – Grand Cane
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Louisiana
De Soto
Grand Cane
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
311
1904
FDIC Certificate Number: 311
FDIC's unique number: 249
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Shreveport
Federal Reserve ID Number: 120056
Report Date: 1970-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1904-06-15 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Grand Cane.
1970-04-11 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank in Mansfield in Mansfield, Louisiana.
1980-09-17 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1998-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Hibernia National Bank in New Orleans, Louisiana.
1998-02-01 Acquired Argentbank in Thibodaux, Louisiana.
1998-07-01 Acquired Peoples Bank & Trust Company in Minden, Louisiana.
1999-01-01 Acquired Hibernia National Bank Of Texas in Texarkana, Texas.
1999-03-08 Acquired First Service Bank in Marshall, Texas.
1999-05-21 Acquired Beaumont Trust Company, National Association in Beaumont, Texas.
2004-05-13 Acquired Coastal Banc, S.S.B. in Houston, Texas.
2006-04-24 Changed name to Capital One, National Association .
2007-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from New Orleans, Louisiana to Mclean, Virginia.
2007-07-01 Acquired Capital One, F.S.B. in Mclean, Virginia.
2007-08-01 Acquired North Fork Bank in Mattituck, New York.
2008-03-08 Acquired Superior Savings Of New England, National Association in Branford, Connecticut.
2009-07-30 Acquired Chevy Chase Bank, F.S.B. in Mclean, Virginia.
2011-04-01 Reorganized.
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Bank of Grand Cane does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bank of Grand Cane, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Grand Cane will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-980