Kentucky – Oldham – La Grange
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Kentucky
Oldham
La Grange
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
33861
1993
FDIC Certificate Number: 33861
FDIC's unique number: 48169
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2135380
Report Date: 2001-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 2001-10-12
1993-12-01 Institution established. Original name: Mid-america Bank, Fsb.
1995-05-01 Moved bank headquarters from Pewee Valley, Kentucky to Lagrange, Kentucky.
1999-05-03 Changed name to Bank Of Louisville, Fsb .
2001-08-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of Louisville in Louisville, Kentucky.
2002-09-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Branch Banking and Trust Company in Winston Salem, North Carolina.
2002-11-08 Acquired First South Bank in Tallahassee, Florida.
2003-03-14 Acquired Equitable Bank in Wheaton, Maryland.
2003-10-11 Acquired Farmers Bank Of Maryland in Annapolis, Maryland.
2003-10-11 Acquired Atlantic Bank in Ocean City, Maryland.
2004-06-11 Acquired Republic Bank in Saint Petersburg, Florida.
2006-09-16 Acquired Main Street Bank in Covington, Georgia.
2006-11-11 Acquired The Home Bank in Ducktown, Tennessee.
2006-11-11 Acquired The Bank/first Citizens Bank in Cleveland, Tennessee.
2006-11-11 Acquired The Home Bank Of Tennessee in Maryville, Tennessee.
2006-12-31 Acquired Branch Banking And Trust Company Of South Carolina in Greenville, South Carolina.
2006-12-31 Acquired Branch Banking And Trust Company Of Virginia in Richmond, Virginia.
2007-08-18 Acquired Coastal Federal Bank in Myrtle Beach, South Carolina.
2008-12-12 Acquired Haven Trust Bank in Duluth, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-14 Acquired Colonial Bank in Montgomery, Alabama as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $24,523,000
Total deposits: $20,711,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Bank of Louisville, FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bank of Louisville, FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Louisville, FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18885