West Virginia – Randolph – Mill Creek
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
West Virginia
Randolph
Mill Creek
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
14515
1911
FDIC Certificate Number: 14515
FDIC's unique number: 9069
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Scott Depot
Federal Reserve ID Number: 886530
Report Date: 1992-09-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1992-10-07
1911-08-10 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Mill Creek.
1991-01-14 Reorganized.
1992-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Mountain Valley Bank, N.A. in Elkins, West Virginia.
1994-10-01 Moved bank headquarters from Mill Creek, West Virginia to Elkins, West Virginia.
Total assets: $36,111,000
Total deposits: $33,529,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Bank of Mill Creek does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bank of Mill Creek, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Mill Creek will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-26209