Nevada – Clark – Las Vegas
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.bankofnevada.com
Nevada
Clark
Las Vegas
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
33897
1994
FDIC Certificate Number: 33897
FDIC's unique number: 54753
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Phoenix
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2197098
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 13
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-09-28
1994-05-20 Institution established. Original name: Bankwest Of Nevada.
2006-04-29 Acquired Nevada First Bank in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2006-04-29 Changed name to Bank Of Nevada .
2006-04-29 Acquired Bank Of Nevada in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2009-02-27 Acquired Security Savings Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $2,842,559,000
Total deposits: $2,449,151,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $2,449,151,000
Equity capital: $317,435,000
Net income: $4,618,000
Return on Assets: 0.33
Return on Equity: 2.95
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Western Alliance Bancorporation
Bank Of Nevada - Aliante Parkway Branch
Bank Of Nevada - Bank Of Nevada
Bank Of Nevada - Centennial Branch
Bank Of Nevada - City Parkway Branch
Bank Of Nevada - Courier Service Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Bank of Nevada does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bank of Nevada, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Nevada will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-592