Nevada – Clark – Las Vegas
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
www.bankofnv.com
Nevada
Clark
Las Vegas
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
57035
2000
FDIC Certificate Number: 57035
FDIC's unique number: 334375
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Phoenix
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2914718
Report Date: 2006-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2006-05-31
2000-10-23 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Nevada.
2000-10-23 Changed primary regulatory agency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2000-10-23 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2002-04-27 Acquired Mesquite State Bank in Mesquite, Nevada.
2006-04-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of Nevada in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2009-02-27 Acquired Security Savings Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $253,393,000
Total deposits: $222,932,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Bank of Nevada does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bank of Nevada, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Nevada will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25641