Delaware – New Castle – New Castle
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
Delaware
New Castle
New Castle
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
27575
1989
FDIC Certificate Number: 27575
FDIC's unique number: 40360
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Claymont
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1404940
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1989-08-18 Institution established. Original name: Discover Card Bank Of New Castle.
1995-07-01 Changed name to Bank Of New Castle .
Total assets: $16,034,000
Total deposits: $500,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $500,000
Equity capital: $15,524,000
Net income: $6,000
Return on Assets: 0.07
Return on Equity: 0.08
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Discover Financial Services
No associations
LandOfFree
Bank of New Castle does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bank of New Castle, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of New Castle will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6886