Louisiana – Morehouse – Oak Ridge
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
Louisiana
Morehouse
Oak Ridge
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
21529
1910
FDIC Certificate Number: 21529
FDIC's unique number: 14890
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Shreveport
Federal Reserve ID Number: 687054
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2007-11-02
1910-10-01 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Bank Of Oak Ridge.
1974-04-11 Became FDIC insured.
1974-04-11 FDIC certificate number changed to .
Total assets: $45,610,000
Total deposits: $40,140,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $40,140,000
Equity capital: $5,280,000
Net income: $208,000
Return on Assets: 0.85
Return on Equity: 7.96
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Oak Ridge Bancshares, Inc.
No associations
LandOfFree
Bank of Oak Ridge does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bank of Oak Ridge, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Oak Ridge will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-26664