Kentucky – Pulaski – Somerset
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kentucky
Pulaski
Somerset
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
20295
1970
FDIC Certificate Number: 20295
FDIC's unique number: 13969
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington
Federal Reserve ID Number: 411419
Report Date: 1985-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1970-11-12 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Somerset.
1985-08-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Cumberland Security Bank, Inc. in Somerset, Kentucky.
1997-02-05 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
Total assets: $25,924,000
Total deposits: $22,155,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Bank of Somerset does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bank of Somerset, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Somerset will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-14270