Kentucky – Fayette – Lexington
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.bankofthebluegrass.com
Kentucky
Fayette
Lexington
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
21161
1972
FDIC Certificate Number: 21161
FDIC's unique number: 14629
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1006513
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1972-04-10 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Bank Of The Bluegrass.
1973-07-16 Became FDIC insured.
1973-07-16 FDIC certificate number changed to .
1981-11-25 Changed name to Bank Of The Bluegrass And Trust Company .
Total assets: $218,562,000
Total deposits: $184,207,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $184,207,000
Equity capital: $28,264,000
Net income: $868,000
Return on Assets: 0.81
Return on Equity: 6.35
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Bluegrass Bancshares, Inc.
Bank Of The Bluegrass And Trust Company - Bank Of The Bluegrass
Bank Of The Bluegrass And Trust Company - Southland Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Bank of the Bluegrass and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bank of the Bluegrass and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of the Bluegrass and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18644