Ohio – Athens – Athens
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Ohio
Athens
Athens
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
6522
1905
FDIC Certificate Number: 6522
FDIC's unique number: 4363
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus
Federal Reserve ID Number: 298012
Report Date: 1997-03-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 7744
The date of the last data update: 1997-06-02
1905-05-16 Institution established. Original name: The Athens National Bank.
1979-10-22 Changed name to Bank One Of Athens, N.A. .
1982-08-02 Acquired The Citizens State Bank in Somerset, Ohio.
1982-08-02 Changed name to Bank One Of Southeastern Ohio, National Association .
1983-07-01 Acquired Bank One Of Pomeroy, N.A. in Pomeroy, Ohio.
1983-07-01 Changed name to Bank One, Athens, National Association .
1984-01-01 Acquired The Tri County Bank in Coolville, Ohio.
1997-05-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
1998-04-01 Acquired First Usa Federal Savings Bank in Wilmington, Delaware.
2003-08-08 Acquired Bank One, West Virginia, National Association in Huntington, West Virginia.
2003-08-08 Acquired Bank One, Wheeling-steubenville, National Association in Wheeling, West Virginia.
2004-11-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $239,932,000
Total deposits: $148,875,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Bank One, Athens, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bank One, Athens, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank One, Athens, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22139