Wisconsin – Outagamie – Kaukauna
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Wisconsin
Outagamie
Kaukauna
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
12346
1916
FDIC Certificate Number: 12346
FDIC's unique number: 7853
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Appleton
Federal Reserve ID Number: 911441
Report Date: 1988-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1916-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Freedom State Bank.
1982-09-20 Moved bank headquarters from Freedom, Wisconsin to Town Of Freedom, Wisconsin.
1983-05-10 Changed name to Firstar Bank Freedom .
1985-11-07 Changed name to Marine Bank Freedom .
1988-06-09 Changed name to Bank One, Freedom .
1989-01-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, Green Bay in Green Bay, Wisconsin.
1996-12-07 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, Wisconsin in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2002-08-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2002-11-08 Acquired Bank One, Illinois, National Association in Springfield, Illinois.
2002-11-08 Acquired American National Bank And Trust Company Of Chicago in Chicago, Illinois.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Oklahoma, National Association in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Kentucky, National Association in Louisville, Kentucky.
2004-11-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $17,488,000
Total deposits: $15,911,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Bank One, Freedom does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bank One, Freedom, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank One, Freedom will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6070