Wisconsin – Brown – Green Bay
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Wisconsin
Brown
Green Bay
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
12332
1919
FDIC Certificate Number: 12332
FDIC's unique number: 7843
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Appleton
Federal Reserve ID Number: 734846
Report Date: 1996-09-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1997-01-16
1919-12-31 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of West De Pere.
1970-01-30 Changed name to The Community Bank .
1983-06-01 Changed name to Firstar Bank De Pere .
1985-10-16 Changed name to Marine Bank Depere .
1986-06-01 Acquired Peoples Marine Bank Of Green Bay in Green Bay, Wisconsin.
1986-06-01 Changed name to Peoples Marine Bank Of Green Bay .
1986-06-01 Moved bank headquarters from De Pere, Wisconsin to Green Bay, Wisconsin.
1988-06-13 Changed name to Bank One, Green Bay .
1989-01-31 Acquired Bank One, Seymour, National Association in Seymour, Wisconsin.
1989-01-31 Acquired Bank One, Freedom in Town Of Freedom, Wisconsin.
1996-12-07 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, Wisconsin in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2002-08-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2002-11-08 Acquired Bank One, Illinois, National Association in Springfield, Illinois.
2002-11-08 Acquired American National Bank And Trust Company Of Chicago in Chicago, Illinois.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Oklahoma, National Association in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Kentucky, National Association in Louisville, Kentucky.
2004-11-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $556,957,000
Total deposits: $434,546,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Bank One, Green Bay has received 1 rating(s) and 1 review(s), resulting in an average rating of 3.44 on a scale from 1 to 5. The overall rating for this bank is good.
If you have personal experience with Bank One, Green Bay, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank One, Green Bay will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Hari
Thanks for sharing exlencelt informations. Your website is very cool. I am impressed by the details that you've on this site. It reveals how nicely you understand this subject. Bookmarked this web page, will come back for extra articles. You, my friend, ROCK! I found just the info I already searched all over the place and simply could not come across. What a perfect site.
Was this review helpful to you? Rating [ 3.44 ]
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-16396