New Hampshire – Hillsborough – Manchester
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
New Hampshire
Hillsborough
Manchester
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
15952
1887
FDIC Certificate Number: 15952
FDIC's unique number: 10183
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 571902
Report Date: 1991-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1991-10-24
1887-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Rochester Savings Bank And Trust Company.
1982-09-15 Changed name to Bankeast Savings Bank And Trust .
1983-01-03 Acquired Bankeast National Bank in Rochester, New Hampshire.
1983-01-03 Acquired Bankeast Savings Bank in Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
1983-01-03 Acquired Bankeast Guaranty Savings Bank in Salem, New Hampshire.
1989-01-01 Acquired Bankeast in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1989-01-01 Changed name to Bankeast .
1989-01-01 Moved bank headquarters from Rochester, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Citizens Bank New Hampshire in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-05-01 Reorganized.
1992-06-01 Acquired First Nh Bank, National Association in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Concord, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
1995-03-30 Acquired Southeast Bank For Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Total assets: $816,843,000
Total deposits: $631,606,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
BankEast does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with BankEast, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and BankEast will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-12543