New Hampshire – Sullivan – Claremont
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
New Hampshire
Sullivan
Claremont
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
6210
1933
FDIC Certificate Number: 6210
FDIC's unique number: 4187
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 49607
Report Date: 1982-12-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 13829
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1933-11-07 Institution established. Original name: Claremont National Bank.
1981-09-08 Changed name to Bankeast, National Association .
1983-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of BankEast in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1984-10-01 Acquired Kingswood Trust And Savings Bank in Wolfeboro, New Hampshire.
1985-12-01 Acquired First Citizens National Bank in Newport, New Hampshire.
1987-11-01 Acquired Hanover Bank & Trust Company in Hanover, New Hampshire.
1989-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of BankEast in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Citizens Bank New Hampshire in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-05-01 Reorganized.
1992-06-01 Acquired First Nh Bank, National Association in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Concord, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
1995-03-30 Acquired Southeast Bank For Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Total assets: $37,767,000
Total deposits: $34,111,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
BankEast, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with BankEast, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and BankEast, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13884