New Hampshire – Strafford – Rochester
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
New Hampshire
Strafford
Rochester
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
10022
1933
FDIC Certificate Number: 10022
FDIC's unique number: 6407
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 469205
Report Date: 1982-12-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 13861
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1933-12-06 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank Of Rochester.
1982-09-15 Changed name to Bankeast National Bank .
1983-01-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of BankEast Savings Bank and Trust in Rochester, New Hampshire.
1989-01-01 Changed name to Bankeast .
1989-01-01 Moved bank headquarters from Rochester, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
1989-01-01 Acquired Bankeast in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Citizens Bank New Hampshire in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-05-01 Reorganized.
1992-06-01 Acquired First Nh Bank, National Association in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Concord, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
1995-03-30 Acquired Southeast Bank For Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Total assets: $25,453,000
Total deposits: $19,918,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
BankEast National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with BankEast National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and BankEast National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-9295