New Hampshire – Rockingham – Portsmouth
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
New Hampshire
Rockingham
Portsmouth
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
17196
1871
FDIC Certificate Number: 17196
FDIC's unique number: 11226
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 468703
Report Date: 1982-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1995-09-19
1871-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Portsmouth Trust Company.
1982-09-15 Changed name to Bankeast Savings Bank .
1983-01-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of BankEast Savings Bank and Trust in Rochester, New Hampshire.
1989-01-01 Changed name to Bankeast .
1989-01-01 Moved bank headquarters from Portsmouth, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
1989-01-01 Acquired Bankeast in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Citizens Bank New Hampshire in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-05-01 Reorganized.
1992-06-01 Acquired First Nh Bank, National Association in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Concord, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
1995-03-30 Acquired Southeast Bank For Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Total assets: $59,703,000
Total deposits: $55,024,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
BankEast Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with BankEast Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and BankEast Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-26263