Maine – Hancock – Bar Harbor
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.bhbt.com
Maine
Hancock
Bar Harbor
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
11971
1887
FDIC Certificate Number: 11971
FDIC's unique number: 7640
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 522605
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 12
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2007-04-24
1887-09-15 Institution established. Original name: Bar Harbor Banking And Trust Company.
2004-04-20 Changed name to Bar Harbor Bank & Trust .
2007-04-24 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
Total assets: $1,152,288,000
Total deposits: $730,205,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $730,205,000
Equity capital: $111,017,000
Net income: $5,940,000
Return on Assets: 1.04
Return on Equity: 11.11
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Bar Harbor Bankshares
Bar Harbor Bank & Trust - Bar Harbor Bank & Trust
Bar Harbor Bank & Trust - Blue Hill Branch
Bar Harbor Bank & Trust - Deer Isle Branch
Bar Harbor Bank & Trust - Ellsworth Branch
Bar Harbor Bank & Trust - Lubec Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Bar Harbor Bank & Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bar Harbor Bank & Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bar Harbor Bank & Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-15668