Delaware – New Castle – Wilmington
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.barclaycardus.com
Delaware
New Castle
Wilmington
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
57203
2001
FDIC Certificate Number: 57203
FDIC's unique number: 359447
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Claymont
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2980209
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-02-07
2001-05-23 Institution established. Original name: Juniper Bank.
2001-05-24 Acquired First Bank, Cbc in Maryville, Missouri.
2006-05-25 Changed name to Barclays Bank Delaware .
Total assets: $14,641,942,000
Total deposits: $7,031,446,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $7,031,446,000
Equity capital: $2,107,713,000
Net income: $197,542,000
Return on Assets: 2.73
Return on Equity: 19.42
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Barclays Plc
No associations
LandOfFree
Barclays Bank Delaware does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Barclays Bank Delaware, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Barclays Bank Delaware will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18049