California – San Mateo – San Mateo
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
www.bayviewbank.com
California
San Mateo
San Mateo
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
31698
1973
FDIC Certificate Number: 31698
FDIC's unique number: 44532
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: San Francisco
Federal Reserve ID Number: 600174
Report Date: 2003-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 23770
The date of the last data update: 2003-11-04
1973-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Bay View Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1981-03-31 Acquired Bay View Federal Savings And Loan Association in San Mateo, California.
1981-11-30 Acquired El Camino Savings And Loan Association in Sunnyvale, California.
1986-09-30 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1989-10-20 Acquired Independence Savings And Loan Association in Vallejo, California.
1989-12-31 Changed name to Bay View Federal Bank, A Federal Savings Bank .
1989-12-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1997-03-17 Changed name to Bay View Bank .
1998-01-02 Acquired Eurekabank, A Federal Savings Bank in San Carlos, California.
1999-03-01 Changed name to Bay View Bank, National Association .
1999-03-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1999-03-01 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2003-09-30 Closed voluntarily and liquidated its assets.
Total assets: $567,245,000
Total deposits: $500,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Bay View Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bay View Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bay View Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-15561