California – San Mateo – San Mateo
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
California
San Mateo
San Mateo
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
28509
1911
FDIC Certificate Number: 28509
FDIC's unique number: 41343
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: San Francisco
Federal Reserve ID Number: 600174
Report Date: 1981-03-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1911-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Bay View Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1981-03-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bay View Federal Savings and Loan Association in San Mateo, California.
1981-11-30 Acquired El Camino Savings And Loan Association in Sunnyvale, California.
1986-09-30 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1989-10-20 Acquired Independence Savings And Loan Association in Vallejo, California.
1989-12-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1989-12-31 Changed name to Bay View Federal Bank, A Federal Savings Bank .
1997-03-17 Changed name to Bay View Bank .
1998-01-02 Acquired Eurekabank, A Federal Savings Bank in San Carlos, California.
1999-03-01 Changed name to Bay View Bank, National Association .
1999-03-01 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
1999-03-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2003-09-30 Closed voluntarily and liquidated its assets.
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Bay View Federal Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bay View Federal Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bay View Federal Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8782