Delaware – New Castle – New Castle
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Delaware
New Castle
New Castle
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
33560
1992
FDIC Certificate Number: 33560
FDIC's unique number: 47442
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Claymont
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1928594
Report Date: 2002-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 22474
The date of the last data update: 2002-08-20
1992-02-21 Institution established. Original name: Beneficial National Bank Usa.
1992-02-21 Acquired Beneficial National Bank Usa in Peapack, New Jersey.
1992-02-21 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
1999-11-07 Moved bank headquarters from Wilmington, Delaware to New Castle, Delaware.
2002-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Household Bank , National Association in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2005-03-01 Changed name to Hsbc Bank Nevada, National Association .
2005-12-01 Acquired Direct Merchants Credit Card Bank, National Association in Scottsdale, Arizona.
Total assets: $76,020,000
Total deposits: $9,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Beneficial National Bank USA does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Beneficial National Bank USA, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Beneficial National Bank USA will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-14529