New Hampshire – Merrimack – Bow
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
www.bowmillsbank.com
New Hampshire
Merrimack
Bow
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
27437
1989
FDIC Certificate Number: 27437
FDIC's unique number: 39911
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1358696
Report Date: 2007-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2007-06-11
1989-01-21 Institution established. Original name: Bow Mills Bank And Trust.
1994-01-12 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2007-05-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Merrimack County Savings Bank in Concord, New Hampshire.
Total assets: $123,614,000
Total deposits: $113,110,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Bow Mills Bank and Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bow Mills Bank and Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bow Mills Bank and Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8216