New Jersey – Middlesex – New Brunswick
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.brunswickbank.com
New Jersey
Middlesex
New Brunswick
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
20220
1970
FDIC Certificate Number: 20220
FDIC's unique number: 13902
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg
Federal Reserve ID Number: 463203
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 7
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-12-27
1970-07-27 Institution established. Original name: Brunswick Bank And Trust Company.
1971-07-30 Changed name to Bank Of Manalapan .
1975-11-03 Acquired New Brunswick Trust Company in New Brunswick, New Jersey.
1975-11-03 Changed name to Brunswick Bank And Trust Company .
1975-11-26 Moved bank headquarters from Manalapan Township, New Jersey to Manalapan, New Jersey.
1985-06-30 Moved bank headquarters from Manalapan, New Jersey to New Brunswick, New Jersey.
Total assets: $123,083,000
Total deposits: $95,590,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $95,590,000
Equity capital: $27,152,000
Net income: $200,000
Return on Assets: 0.32
Return on Equity: 1.48
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Brunswick Bancorp
Brunswick Bank And Trust Company - Brunswick Bank And Trust Comp
Brunswick Bank And Trust Company - Englishtown Branch
Brunswick Bank And Trust Company - Freehold Township Branch
Brunswick Bank And Trust Company - Monroe Township Branch
Brunswick Bank And Trust Company - New Brunswick Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Brunswick Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Brunswick Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Brunswick Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3002