Kentucky – Bullitt – Shepherdsville
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Kentucky
Bullitt
Shepherdsville
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
31471
1959
FDIC Certificate Number: 31471
FDIC's unique number: 44305
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown
Federal Reserve ID Number: 246871
Report Date: 1994-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1996-01-31
1959-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Bullitt Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1990-01-02 Changed name to Bullitt Federal Savings Bank .
1990-01-02 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1995-01-04 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Federal Savings Bank of Elizabethtown in Elizabethtown, Kentucky.
2003-01-08 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2003-01-08 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2003-01-08 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2008-06-25 Acquired The Farmers State Bank in Lanesville, Indiana.
Total assets: $49,682,000
Total deposits: $39,709,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Bullitt Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Bullitt Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bullitt Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19927