Nevada – Clark – Las Vegas
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
www.bbnv.com
Nevada
Clark
Las Vegas
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
34077
1995
FDIC Certificate Number: 34077
FDIC's unique number: 56214
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Phoenix
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2352815
Report Date: 2007-03-31
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 2007-05-25
1995-10-18 Institution established. Original name: Las Vegas Business Bank.
1999-01-11 Changed name to Business Bank Of Nevada .
1999-11-24 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2007-05-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of City National Bank in Beverly Hills, California.
2009-12-18 Acquired Imperial Capital Bank in La Jolla, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-05-07 Acquired 1st Pacific Bank Of California in San Diego, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-05-28 Acquired Sun West Bank in Las Vegas, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-04-08 Moved bank headquarters from Beverly Hills, California to Los Angeles, California.
2011-04-08 Acquired Nevada Commerce Bank in Las Vegas, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $524,012,000
Total deposits: $464,120,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Business Bank of Nevada does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Business Bank of Nevada, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Business Bank of Nevada will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17934