Kentucky – Taylor – Campbellsville
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Kentucky
Taylor
Campbellsville
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
33232
1990
FDIC Certificate Number: 33232
FDIC's unique number: 46670
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1824324
Report Date: 2007-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 22225
The date of the last data update: 2008-01-08
1990-12-14 Institution established. Original name: Campbellsville National Bank.
2007-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of FORCHT BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION in Lexington, Kentucky.
Total assets: $70,407,000
Total deposits: $60,621,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Campbellsville National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Campbellsville National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Campbellsville National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-26184