Connecticut – Fairfield – New Fairfield
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Connecticut
Fairfield
New Fairfield
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
26931
1987
FDIC Certificate Number: 26931
FDIC's unique number: 36323
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hartford
Federal Reserve ID Number: 103004
Report Date: 1994-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1994-05-23
1987-03-31 Institution established. Original name: Candlewood Bank And Trust Company.
1994-04-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The New Milford Bank and Trust Company in New Milford, Connecticut.
1998-03-03 Changed name to Nmbt .
2000-04-15 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Summit Bank in Norwalk, Connecticut.
2001-03-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2004-02-01 Acquired Progress Bank in Blue Bell, Pennsylvania.
2005-03-18 Acquired Fleet Maine, National Association in South Portland, Maine.
2005-06-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.
Total assets: $55,038,000
Total deposits: $49,180,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Candlewood Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Candlewood Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Candlewood Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-15092