Colorado – Moffat – Craig
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Colorado
Moffat
Craig
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
22113
1975
FDIC Certificate Number: 22113
FDIC's unique number: 15361
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 723055
Report Date: 1988-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 16501
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1975-09-25 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank In Craig.
1987-03-01 Changed name to Central Bank Of Craig, National Association .
1988-09-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Security Bank of Craig in Craig, Colorado.
1998-11-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Imperial Bank in Inglewood, California.
1998-12-01 Acquired Imperial Bank Arizona in Sun City, Arizona.
1999-10-20 Acquired Imperial Mutual Savings Bank in Kirkland, Washington.
2001-09-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Comerica Bank-California in San Jose, California.
2003-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Comerica Bank in Detroit, Michigan.
2007-11-01 Moved bank headquarters from San Jose, California to Dallas, Texas.
2007-11-01 Reorganized.
2011-07-28 Acquired Sterling Bank in Houston, Texas.
Total assets: $19,431,000
Total deposits: $18,177,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Central Bank of Craig, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Central Bank of Craig, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Central Bank of Craig, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8272