Missouri – Pettis – Sedalia
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
www.cbofmo.com
Missouri
Pettis
Sedalia
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
13787
1891
FDIC Certificate Number: 13787
FDIC's unique number: 8619
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbia Mo
Federal Reserve ID Number: 491251
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1891-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Smithton Bank.
1981-02-06 Changed name to The Smithton Bank, N.A. .
1981-07-01 Changed name to Central National Bank Of Missouri .
1982-03-08 Moved bank headquarters from Smithton, Missouri to Sedalia, Missouri.
1986-11-14 Changed name to Central Bank Of Missouri .
1986-11-14 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1996-03-12 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
Total assets: $80,818,000
Total deposits: $67,392,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $67,392,000
Equity capital: $9,643,000
Net income: $401,000
Return on Assets: 0.99
Return on Equity: 8.51
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Warren County Bancshares, Inc.
Central Bank Of Missouri - 2500 Range Line Road Branch
Central Bank Of Missouri - Central Bank Of Missouri
Central Bank Of Missouri - Main And Bridge Street Facility
No associations
LandOfFree
Central Bank of Missouri does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Central Bank of Missouri, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Central Bank of Missouri will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-12835