Kentucky – Fayette – Lexington
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.centralbank.com
Kentucky
Fayette
Lexington
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
15815
1938
FDIC Certificate Number: 15815
FDIC's unique number: 10059
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1007015
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 23
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-02-22
1938-04-15 Institution established. Original name: Central Bank & Trust Co.
1998-08-31 Acquired Pioneer Federal Savings Bank in Winchester, Kentucky.
2011-01-18 Acquired Central Bank, Fsb in Nicholasville, Kentucky.
Total assets: $1,864,480,000
Total deposits: $1,610,178,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $1,610,178,000
Equity capital: $168,235,000
Net income: $5,958,000
Return on Assets: 0.63
Return on Equity: 7.17
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Central Bancshares, Inc.
Central Bank & Trust Co. - Andover Banking Center Branch
Central Bank & Trust Co. - Berea Branch
Central Bank & Trust Co. - Central Bank & Trust Co.
Central Bank & Trust Co. - Crestview Hills Branch
Central Bank & Trust Co. - Eastland Banking Center
No associations
LandOfFree
Central Bank & Trust Co. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Central Bank & Trust Co., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Central Bank & Trust Co. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-858