Kentucky – Boyle – Danville
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
www.centralkyfsb.com
Kentucky
Boyle
Danville
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
31156
1886
FDIC Certificate Number: 31156
FDIC's unique number: 43990
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington
Federal Reserve ID Number: 633275
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 706E3
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21
1886-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Central Kentucky Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1994-12-29 Changed name to Central Kentucky Federal Savings Bank .
1994-12-29 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2001-06-01 Acquired First Lancaster Federal Savings Bank in Lancaster, Kentucky.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $130,971,000
Total deposits: $103,982,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $103,982,000
Equity capital: $13,528,000
Net income: $151,000
Return on Assets: 0.23
Return on Equity: 2.25
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Central Kentucky Federal Savings Bank - Central Kentucky Federal
Central Kentucky Federal Savings Bank - Danville Branch
Central Kentucky Federal Savings Bank - First Lancaster Federal
No associations
LandOfFree
Central Kentucky Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Central Kentucky Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Central Kentucky Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18626