Illinois – Kankakee – Kankakee
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
www.centrue.com
Illinois
Kankakee
Kankakee
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
10881
1920
FDIC Certificate Number: 10881
FDIC's unique number: 6963
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Champaign
Federal Reserve ID Number: 212979
Report Date: 2006-09-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2007-01-24
1920-12-30 Institution established. Original name: State Bank Of Aviston.
2003-10-17 Acquired Kfs Bank, F.S.B. in Kankakee, Illinois.
2003-10-17 Changed name to Centrue Bank .
2003-10-17 Moved bank headquarters from Aviston, Illinois to Kankakee, Illinois.
2004-01-20 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2004-03-05 Acquired Parish Bank And Trust Company in Momence, Illinois.
2005-08-24 Acquired Illinois Community Bank in Effingham, Illinois.
2006-11-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Centrue Bank in Streator, Illinois.
2007-06-22 Acquired Bank 10 in Belton, Missouri.
Total assets: $621,777,000
Total deposits: $472,886,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Centrue Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Centrue Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Centrue Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20686