Delaware – New Castle – Newark
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.chase.com
Delaware
New Castle
Newark
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
23702
1982
FDIC Certificate Number: 23702
FDIC's unique number: 16580
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Claymont
Federal Reserve ID Number: 489913
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 23160
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 1
The date of the last data update: 2007-06-12
1982-02-11 Institution established. Original name: The Chase Manhattan Bank , National Association.
1990-06-21 Changed name to The Chase Manhattan Bank .
1990-06-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1993-05-05 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1996-08-19 Changed name to Chase Manhattan Bank Usa, National Association .
1996-08-19 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1996-08-30 Changed organization type to Credit Card Bank.
1996-12-01 Acquired Chase Manhattan Bank Usa, National Association in Jericho, New York.
2000-06-01 Acquired Chase Manhattan Bank Delaware in Wilmington, Delaware.
2001-02-01 Moved bank headquarters from Wilmington, Delaware to Newark, Delaware.
2004-10-01 Acquired Bank One, Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2005-03-01 Changed name to Chase Bank Usa, National Association .
2007-03-31 Acquired Pier 1 National Bank in Omaha, Nebraska.
Total assets: $116,342,972,000
Total deposits: $39,217,687,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $25,651,070,000
Equity capital: $25,629,419,000
Net income: $2,321,066,000
Return on Assets: 3.78
Return on Equity: 18.19
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Jpmorgan Chase & Co.
Chase Bank Usa, National Association - Bank One Delaware N.A. Br
Chase Bank Usa, National Association - Cayman Islands Branch Frg
Chase Bank Usa, National Association - Chase Bank Usa, National
Chase Bank Usa, National Association - Chase Usa Na Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Chase Bank USA, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Chase Bank USA, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Chase Bank USA, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-10591