Colorado – Montezuma – Cortez
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Colorado
Montezuma
Cortez
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
25719
1984
FDIC Certificate Number: 25719
FDIC's unique number: 17596
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 821858
Report Date: 2007-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2007-10-02
1984-11-01 Institution established. Original name: Cheyenne Mountain Bank.
2007-08-25 Moved bank headquarters from Colorado Springs, Colorado to Cortez, Colorado.
2007-08-25 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Four Corners Community Bank in Farmington, New Mexico.
Total assets: $42,056,000
Total deposits: $35,958,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Cheyenne Mountain Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Cheyenne Mountain Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Cheyenne Mountain Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-530