South Dakota – Minnehaha – Sioux Falls
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.citibank.com
South Dakota
Minnehaha
Sioux Falls
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
7213
1812
FDIC Certificate Number: 7213
FDIC's unique number: 4759
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Sioux Falls
Federal Reserve ID Number: 476810
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 1461
Number of Domestic Offices: 1041
Number of Foreign Offices: 281
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-06
1812-06-16 Institution established. Original name: First National City Bank.
1976-01-02 Acquired Citibank , National Association in Woodbury Township, New York.
1976-01-02 Acquired Citibank , National Association in Islip Township, New York.
1976-03-01 Changed name to Citibank, N. A. .
1982-06-12 Acquired Banco Regional in Bayamon, Puerto Rico.
1984-08-16 Acquired Girod Trust Company in San Juan, Puerto Rico.
2001-07-17 Acquired European American Bank in New York City, New York.
2001-07-17 Changed name to Citibank, National Association .
2003-08-30 Acquired Citibank in Pittsford, New York.
2006-10-01 Acquired Citibank in New Castle, Delaware.
2006-10-01 Acquired Citicorp Trust, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2006-10-01 Acquired Cfsb, National Association in Reston, Virginia.
2006-10-01 Acquired Citibank Texas, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
2006-10-01 Acquired West, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2006-10-01 Moved bank headquarters from New York City, New York to Las Vegas, Nevada.
2008-11-23 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2011-07-01 Acquired Citibank , N.A. in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2011-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Las Vegas, Nevada to Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
Total assets: $1216291000,000
Total deposits: $861,055,000,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $314,469,000,000
Equity capital: $127,846,000,000
Net income: $1,863,000,000
Return on Assets: 0.32
Return on Equity: 2.9
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Citigroup Inc.
Citibank, National Association - 1 West Bay State & Garfield Bra
Citibank, National Association - 10 Almaden Boulevard Branch
Citibank, National Association - 100 Robertson Blvd Branch
Citibank, National Association - 100 South First Ave Branch
Citibank, National Association - 100 South Main Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Citibank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Citibank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citibank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13878