Delaware – New Castle – Wilmington
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
www.citicorptrustbank.com
Delaware
New Castle
Wilmington
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
18708
1963
FDIC Certificate Number: 18708
FDIC's unique number: 12577
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Claymont
Federal Reserve ID Number: 374112
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 714E3
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21
1963-02-25 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Wilmington.
1988-08-05 Moved bank headquarters from Wilmington, Delaware to Newark, Delaware.
1988-12-13 Changed name to Primerica Bank .
1994-06-21 Changed name to The Travelers Bank .
1997-11-24 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1997-11-25 Changed name to Travelers Bank & Trust, Fsb .
1997-11-25 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Office Of Thrift Supervision.
1997-11-25 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2001-12-01 Acquired Citi Fiduciary Trust Company in New York, New York.
2001-12-01 Acquired Citi Fiduciary Trust Company Of Florida in West Palm Beach, Florida.
2001-12-01 Acquired Citi Fiduciary Trust Company Of Texas in Dallas, Texas.
2001-12-01 Acquired Citi Fiduciary Trust Bank Of Michigan in Farmington Hills, Michigan.
2001-12-01 Acquired Citi Fiduciary Trust Company Of New Jersey in Red Bank, New Jersey.
2002-08-15 Changed name to Citicorp Trust Bank, Fsb .
2005-01-15 Moved bank headquarters from Newark, Delaware to Wilmington, Delaware.
2006-07-01 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
2008-11-23 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $11,750,980,000
Total deposits: $132,080,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $132,080,000
Equity capital: $1,292,930,000
Net income: $-10,836,000
Return on Assets: -0.17
Return on Equity: -1.65
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Citigroup Inc.
No associations
LandOfFree
Citicorp Trust Bank, fsb does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Citicorp Trust Bank, fsb, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citicorp Trust Bank, fsb will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20643