Indiana – Porter – Hebron
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
Indiana
Porter
Hebron
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
9084
1889
FDIC Certificate Number: 9084
FDIC's unique number: 5816
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Chicago
Federal Reserve ID Number: 245249
Report Date: 1974-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1889-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Citizens Bank.
1975-02-28 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank, Valparaiso in Valparaiso, Indiana.
2008-06-07 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of 1st Source Bank in South Bend, Indiana.
Total assets: $11,692,000
Total deposits: $10,367,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Citizens Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Citizens Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17136