Kentucky – Grant – Dry Ridge
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kentucky
Grant
Dry Ridge
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
8789
1918
FDIC Certificate Number: 8789
FDIC's unique number: 5597
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington
Federal Reserve ID Number: 992918
Report Date: 1995-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1995-04-07
1918-06-01 Institution established. Original name: Citizens Bank.
1995-04-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Community First Bank of Kentucky in Warsaw, Kentucky.
1998-12-11 Acquired Bank Of Crittenden in Crittenden, Kentucky.
1999-06-25 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Community First Bank, National Association in Maysville, Kentucky.
2000-09-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Integra Bank National Association in Evansville, Indiana.
2001-01-31 Acquired West Kentucky Bank in Madisonville, Kentucky.
2007-04-10 Acquired Prairie Bank And Trust Company in Bridgeview, Illinois.
2011-07-29 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Old National Bank in Evansville, Indiana.
2011-07-29 FDIC closing information for
Integra Bank National Association : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/integra.html.
Total assets: $25,066,000
Total deposits: $19,660,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Citizens Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Citizens Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-2667