Kentucky – Owen – New Liberty
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kentucky
Owen
New Liberty
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
8770
1884
FDIC Certificate Number: 8770
FDIC's unique number: 5583
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown
Federal Reserve ID Number: 528746
Report Date: 2008-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2008-08-11
1884-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Citizens Bank.
2008-08-09 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Farmers Bank and Trust Company in Owenton, Kentucky.
Total assets: $17,139,000
Total deposits: $15,270,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Citizens Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Citizens Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6746