Iowa – Black Hawk – Hudson
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
Iowa
Black Hawk
Hudson
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
16257
1869
FDIC Certificate Number: 16257
FDIC's unique number: 10449
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Cedar Rapids
Federal Reserve ID Number: 177742
Report Date: 2003-03-31
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 2003-07-31
1869-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Citizens State Bank.
1984-07-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank And Trust Co., National Association .
1992-06-30 Changed name to Citizens Bank And Trust Company .
1992-06-30 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1995-08-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
1996-12-16 Moved bank headquarters from Belle Plaine, Iowa to Hudson, Iowa.
2003-06-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of MidWestOne Bank & Trust in Oskaloosa, Iowa.
2006-01-01 Changed name to Midwestone Bank .
2006-01-01 Acquired Midwestone Bank in Burlington, Iowa.
2006-01-01 Acquired Central Valley Bank in Ottumwa, Iowa.
2006-01-01 Acquired Pella State Bank in Pella, Iowa.
2008-08-09 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of MidWestOneBank in Iowa City, Iowa.
2008-09-03 Changed name to Midwestone Bank .
Total assets: $71,768,000
Total deposits: $61,052,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Citizens Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Citizens Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6824