New Hampshire – Hillsborough – Manchester
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
inactive
New Hampshire
Hillsborough
Manchester
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
inactive
6214
1864
FDIC Certificate Number: 6214
FDIC's unique number: 4191
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 62101
Report Date: 2007-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 2007-09-19
1864-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Concord National Bank.
1978-06-30 Acquired The Pittsfield National Bank in Pittsfield, New Hampshire.
1986-07-07 Changed name to First Capital Bank, National Association .
1988-08-08 Changed name to First Capital Bank .
1988-08-08 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1991-01-01 Acquired First Nh Bank Of Lebanon in Lebanon, New Hampshire.
1991-01-01 Changed name to First Nh Bank .
1991-01-01 Acquired First Nh Banks Granite State in Rochester, New Hampshire.
1991-01-01 Acquired The Exeter Banking Company in Exeter, New Hampshire.
1991-01-01 Acquired First Central Bank in Laconia, New Hampshire.
1991-01-01 Acquired First Nh-white Mountain Bank in North Conway, New Hampshire.
1991-03-29 Acquired City Bank And Trust in Claremont, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Nashua Trust Company in Nashua, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Bankeast in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Amoskeag Bank in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Bank Meridian, National Association in Hampton, New Hampshire.
1992-05-01 Reorganized.
1992-06-01 Acquired First Nh Bank, National Association in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Concord, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
1995-03-30 Acquired Southeast Bank For Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Total assets: $10,077,634,000
Total deposits: $6,412,055,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Citizens Bank New Hampshire does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Citizens Bank New Hampshire, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens Bank New Hampshire will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13880