Missouri – Cass – Harrisonville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Missouri
Cass
Harrisonville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
8581
1903
FDIC Certificate Number: 8581
FDIC's unique number: 5481
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 881553
Report Date: 1999-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-08-13
1903-10-22 Institution established. Original name: Citizens Bank Of Carl Junction.
1991-03-29 Changed name to Citizens Bank Of Missouri .
1996-01-29 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
1997-10-24 Moved bank headquarters from Carl Junction, Missouri to Harrisonville, Missouri.
1999-08-05 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of BC National Banks in Butler, Missouri.
2008-01-07 Moved bank headquarters from Harrisonville, Missouri to Butler, Missouri.
2010-04-30 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Community First Bank in Butler, Missouri.
2010-04-30 FDIC closing information for
Bc National Banks : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/bc-natl.html.
Total assets: $24,852,000
Total deposits: $17,722,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Citizens Bank of Missouri does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Citizens Bank of Missouri, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens Bank of Missouri will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-15318