Kentucky – Oldham – La Grange
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kentucky
Oldham
La Grange
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
11363
1930
FDIC Certificate Number: 11363
FDIC's unique number: 7260
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown
Federal Reserve ID Number: 572749
Report Date: 1992-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1995-06-09
1930-07-24 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Oldham County.
1973-03-02 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1986-04-17 Changed name to Citizens Fidelity Bank And Trust Company Oldham County .
1992-08-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citizens Fidelity Bank and Trust Company in Louisville, Kentucky.
1993-02-08 Changed name to Pnc Bank, Kentucky, Inc. .
1997-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, National Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
2000-04-07 Moved bank headquarters from Louisville, Kentucky to Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
2000-11-30 Acquired Pnc Converted Bank, National Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
2001-03-31 Acquired Pnc Advisors, National Association in Boston, Massachusetts.
2001-09-30 Acquired Hilliard Lyons Trust Company in Louisville, Kentucky.
2004-03-19 Acquired United Trust Bank in Bridgewater, New Jersey.
2005-05-13 Acquired Riggs National Trust Company in Mclean, Virginia.
2007-09-14 Acquired Farmers & Mechanics Bank in Frederick, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired The Citizens National Bank in Laurel, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile Eastern Shore Bank in Chestertown, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired The National Bank Of Fredericksburg in Fredericksburg, Virginia.
2007-09-14 Acquired Marshall National Bank And Trust Company in Marshall, Virginia.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile Peninsula Bank in Selbyville, Delaware.
2007-09-14 Acquired The Annapolis Banking And Trust Company in Annapolis, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Westminster Union Bank in Westminster, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile County Bank in Elkton, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile Southern Maryland Bank in Leonardtown, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile-safe Deposit And Trust Company in Baltimore, Maryland.
2008-03-07 Acquired The Yardville National Bank in Yardville, New Jersey.
2008-08-08 Acquired Blc Bank N. A. in Strasburg, Pennsylvania.
2009-08-14 Acquired Dwelling House Savings And Loan Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-21 Moved bank headquarters from Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania to Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-08-21 Acquired Pnc Bank, Delaware in Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-11-06 Acquired National City Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.
Total assets: $134,928,000
Total deposits: $121,362,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Citizens Fidelity Bank and Trust Company Oldham County does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Citizens Fidelity Bank and Trust Company Oldham County, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens Fidelity Bank and Trust Company Oldham County will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8699