Indiana – Ripley – Batesville
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Indiana
Ripley
Batesville
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
28971
1889
FDIC Certificate Number: 28971
FDIC's unique number: 41805
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Indianapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 268574
Report Date: 1983-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-07-17
1889-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Citizens-permanent Savings And Loan Association.
1983-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Home Federal Savings Bank in Seymour, Indiana.
1984-08-31 Acquired Mite Federal Savings And Loan Association in Madison, Indiana.
1988-01-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1990-04-30 Acquired Fidelity Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Seymour in Seymour, Indiana.
1997-01-28 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2001-12-31 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2001-12-31 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2001-12-31 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Reserve Board.
2001-12-31 Moved bank headquarters from Seymour, Indiana to Columbus, Indiana.
2002-10-01 Changed name to Homefederal Bank .
2008-03-01 Changed name to Indiana Bank And Trust Company .
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Citizens-Permanent Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Citizens-Permanent Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens-Permanent Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-1520